Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Magana, Maria Elvia, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincent J. O'Neill, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
COVID-19 NOTICE: Until further notice, all attorneys and self-represented parties in law and motion hearings must appear telephonically via Court Call; there shall be no personal appearances without t...
Judge: Ronda McKaig |
|
January 29, 2021 | as to Maria Elvia Magana | ||
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name filed by Magana, Maria Elvia on 01/29/2021. | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name has been Granted. | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication (12/24/20, 12/31/20, 1/7/21, 1/14/21) filed by Magana, Maria Elvia on 01/19/2021. | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed by Magana, Maria Elvia on 12/18/2020. | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Magana, Maria Elvia Application for Waiver granted in full. | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed by Magana, Maria Elvia on 12/18/2020. Filed By: Magana, Maria Elvia(Petitioner) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.