Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tipton, James Peter, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Ronda J. McKaig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonda J. McKaig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2020 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
COVID-19 NOTICE: Until further notice, all attorneys and self-represented parties in law and motion hearings must appear telephonically via Court Call; there shall be no personal appearances without t...
Judge: Ronda McKaig |
|
February 02, 2021 |
In the Matter of Tipton
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
||
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name has been Granted. | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name filed by Tipton, James Peter on 02/02/2021. | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication (Published with Camarillo Acorn Newspaper; 12/26/2020, 01/02/2021, 01/08/2021, 01/15/2021) filed by Tipton, James Peter on 01/28/2021. | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
OSC - Change of Name - In the Matter of Tipton scheduled for 02/02/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 41 at Ventura.
Judge: Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed by Tipton, James Peter on 12/15/2020. | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed by Tipton, James Peter on 12/15/2020. Filed By: Tipton, James Peter(Petitioner) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.