Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Stewart, Sexton E, Stewart, Beverly A, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against Conejo Restoration, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Ronda J. McKaig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonda J. McKaig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2021 |
for Release of Claim of Lien
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
||
April 05, 2021 |
for Release of Claim of Lien
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
||
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - Other - for Release of Claim of Lien scheduled for 04/06/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 41 was vacated.
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Electronic Service - Notice of Settlement; Request to Take Hearing off Calendar) filed by Stewart, Beverly A; Stewart, Sexton E on 03/24/2021. | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Stewart, Beverly A; Stewart, Sexton E on 03/24/2021. | |
March 12, 2021 |
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
||
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - Other - for Release of Claim of Lien scheduled for 04/06/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 41 at Ventura.
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Lodging (of Recorded Release of Mechanics Lien) filed by Conejo Restoration on 03/09/2021. | |
March 05, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
COVID-19 NOTICE: Until further notice, all attorneys and self-represented parties in law and motion hearings must appear via Court Call; there shall be no personal appearances without the prior approv...
Judge: Ronda McKaig |
|
March 05, 2021 |
for Release of Claim of Lien
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.