Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Rex Vital, Loquintha Danielle, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Matthew P. Guasco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew P. Guasco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2020 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2021 |
In the Matter of Rex Vital
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
||
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication (Published 12/11/20, 12/18/20, 12/25/20, and 01/01/21) filed by Rex Vital, Loquintha Danielle on 01/04/2021. | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 20.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
OSC - Change of Name - In the Matter of Rex Vital scheduled for 02/02/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed by Rex Vital, Loquintha Danielle on 12/09/2020. | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed by Rex Vital, Loquintha Danielle on 12/09/2020. Filed By: Rex Vital, Loquintha Danielle(Petitioner) | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rex Vital, Loquintha Danielle on 12/09/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.