Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Police Chief Darin Schindler Of The Ventura Police Department, City Of San Buenaventura, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case against Morrow, Randy, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Paul W. Baelly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul W. Baelly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2020 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2021 |
Review Hearing
Judge: Paul W. Baelly |
||
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by City of San Buenaventura; Police Chief Darin Schindler of the Ventura Police Department on 04/13/2021. | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing (and Judgment; weapon forfeited. PC 33870) filed by City of San Buenaventura on 04/01/2021. | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Subpoenaed record submitted by Ventura County Medical Center on 02/01/2021 updated | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (Re Review Hearing on September 20, 2021) filed by City of San Buenaventura; Police Chief Darin Schindler of the Ventura Police Department on 03/24/2021. | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Hearing (CCM) - Review Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 27 at Ventura.
Judge: Paul W. Baelly |
|
March 22, 2021 |
Judge: Paul W. Baelly |
||
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Hearing re Return of Deadly Weapon Welf. & Inst. Code 8102c filed by City of San Buenaventura was granted. | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Hearing re Return of Deadly Weapon Welf. & Inst. Code 8102c has been Granted. | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.