Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Corona, Sandra, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Gonzalez, Melinda, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryHarassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2021 | |||
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Corona, Sandra on 12/15/2020. | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 01/13/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura. | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Corona, Sandra on 12/08/2020. | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Re Ex Parte Notice VN028 filed by Corona, Sandra on 12/08/2020. | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Corona, Sandra on 12/08/2020. Filed By: Corona, Sandra(Petitioner) Refers To: Gonzalez, Melinda(Respondent) | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Consent For Court Assignment filed by Corona, Sandra on 12/08/2020. | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (Granted) filed by Corona, Sandra on 12/08/2020. | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 34. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.