Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Nakamura, Gary, Nakamura, Linda, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Corral, Frank, against Nakamura, Linda, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 09, 2020 |
CategoryTrust Proceedings |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Remittitur (Opinion or decision entered in the above-entitled cause on 12/02/21 and that this order, opinion or decision has now become final. Respondent(s) shall recover costs on appeal) filed by the Ventura Superior Court on 02/07/2022 | |
January 05, 2022 | |||
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Nakamura, Linda on 01/04/2022. | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition Other (PR) - scheduled for 01/05/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 was vacated. | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy of Order from District Court of Appeal (It appearing that the appellant is in default purusuant to Rule 8.140(b) CRC the appeal filed 10/29/21 is dismissed) filed by The Superior Court of Ventura on 12/02/2021. | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Linda,Nakamura appeal defaulted due to Failure to Designate Oral Record on Appeal. | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Linda,Nakamura appeal defaulted due to Failure to Designate Clerk's Transcript. | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing (Continued) filed by Nakamura, Gary on 11/04/2021. | |
November 03, 2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.