Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mobile Mini Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hettena, Alexander V, against Structural Diagnostics Inc, represented by Stephens, Creighton A, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Ronda J. McKaig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonda J. McKaig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2020 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2022 | |||
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Trial Setting Conference - scheduled for 08/12/2022 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Mobil Mini Inc on 07/18/2022. | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Trial Setting Conference - scheduled for 08/12/2022 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference heard 05/06/2022 08:15:00 AM. | |
May 06, 2022 | |||
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed by Structural Diagnostics Inc on 04/28/2022. | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed by Mobil Mini Inc on 04/11/2022. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.