Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Victor Andrade By And Through His Successor In Interest Todd Andrade, Mcdonough, Nannette, Andrade, Todd, Andrade, Victor, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Gharibian, Art, against Rezael, Reza, California Care Facility For The Elderly Corp, California Care Rcfe Baxter, represented by Covner, Andrew H., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Jeffrey G. Bennett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey G. Bennett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 26, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2021 | |||
February 22, 2021 |
Re: JT Time Est 6-7 Days
Judge: Jeffrey G. Bennett |
||
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Andrade, Todd; McDonough, Nannette; Victor Andrade by and through his successor in interest Todd Andrade on 02/19/2021. | |
January 21, 2021 |
Re: Trial
Judge: Jeffrey G. Bennett |
||
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint - Amended (FIRST) filed by Victor Andrade by and through his successor in interest Todd Andrade; Andrade, Todd; McDonough, Nannette on 01/14/2021. Filed By: McDonough, Nannette(Plaintiff) | Victor Andrade by and through his successor in interest Todd Andrade(Plaintiff) | Andrade, Todd(Plaintiff) Refers To: California Care Facility for the Elderly Corp(Defendant) | Rezael, Reza(Defendant) | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | McDonough, Nannette added as a Plaintiff effective 01/14/2021. | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Victor Andrade by and through his successor in interest Todd Andrade added as a Plaintiff effective 01/14/2021. | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order (Allowing Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Transferring the Right to Maintain the Action to Todd Andrade as Victor Andrades Successor In Interest) filed by Andrade, Victor; Andrade, Todd; McDonough, Nannette on 01/14/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.