Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Ventura, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Pomerance, Drew E., against The Travelers Indemnity Company, Certain Underwriters At Lloyds Of London Subscribing To Policy Number Lc106902, represented by Peterson, Mark D., Sullivan, Susan Koehler, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 07, 2020 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2021 | |||
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate and Receipt for Transfer of Records returned signed and dated 02/11/21 by Mariah Salazar CSA II LA case number 21STCV05531 | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Mail Returned Undeliverable (Clerks Certificate and Receipt for Transfer of Records-as to Mark D Peterson-Return to Sender-Attempted-Not Known-Unable to Forward) received from The Superior Court of Ventura on 02/16/2021 | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Returned Certified Mail received signed by "Civil 1204" and dated 01/27/21. | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Case file contents transferred to receiving court Los Angeles pursuant to court order. Los Angeles Superior Court Spring Street | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy Number LC106902 on 01/04/2021. | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Granting (Motion for Change of Venue) filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy Number LC106902 on 12/15/2020. | |
December 10, 2020 |
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
||
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion for Change of Venue (CLM) heard 12/10/2020 08:20:00 AM. | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | The Court orders this matter be transferred to the Superior Court of California for the County of Los Angeles upon payment of all the necessary fees required by law. The clerk of this court is authorized to transfer all the pleadings and papers herein to the clerk of the receiving court. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.