Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
P W Gillibrand Co Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jones, Greg W, against Ambriz, Freddy, Ambriz Trucking &Amp; Sons Inc, Ambriz Trucking & Sons Inc, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin G. DeNoce Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 07, 2020 |
CategoryOther Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2021 |
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
||
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/30/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by P W Gillibrand Co Inc on 03/30/2021. | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk submitted by P W Gillibrand Co Inc rejected on 12/17/2020. | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by P W Gillibrand Co Inc on 09/17/2020. | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Ambriz, Freddy on Complaint. | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Ambriz Trucking & Sons Inc on Complaint. | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Freddy Ambriz, Agent) filed by P W Gillibrand Co Inc on 08/17/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.