Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Petersons, Marni, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ranieri, Anthony N., against Smith, Douglas A, Smith, Christine E, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin G. DeNoce Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 07, 2020 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2021 |
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
||
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/30/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Petersons, Marni on 04/28/2021. | |
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 43.
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
|
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/30/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
|
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Petersons, Marni on 08/07/2020. Filed By: Petersons, Marni(Plaintiff) Refers To: Smith, Christine(Defendant) | Smith, Douglas(Defendant) | |
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Petersons, Marni on 08/07/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.