Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jones, Ashley Nicole filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 07, 2020 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2020 | |||
August 11, 2020 | Ex-Parte application for guardianship | ||
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Ex-parte application for Temporary Guardianship requested by Elizabeth Mata is granted. | |
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Order on Ex Parte Application (for Temporary Guardianship) filed by Mata, Elizabeth on 08/11/2020. | |
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Letters of Temporary Guardianship or Conservatorship (Issued to Elizabeth Mata) filed by Mata, Elizabeth on 08/11/2020. | |
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Temporary Guardian or Conservator (Elizabeth Mata is Appointed Temporary Guardian) filed by Mata, Elizabeth on 08/11/2020. | |
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian or Conservator has been Granted. | |
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Letter issued on 08/11/2020. | |
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Court orders temporary letters issued . | |
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian or Conservator filed by Mata, Elizabeth on 08/07/2020. Filed By: Mata, Elizabeth(Proposed Guardian) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.