Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hanson, Christopher James filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 07, 2020 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2020 | |||
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Letters of Temporary Guardianship or Conservatorship (Issued to Kathleen & David Long) filed by Long, Kathleen Joanne; Long, David Christopher on 09/03/2020. | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Letter issued on 09/03/2020. | |
August 28, 2020 | |||
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Court orders temporary letters issued . | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | The Court appoints Kathleen Joanne Long and David Christopher Long as Temporary Co-Guardian(s). | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - PERSONAL (As to Christopher Hanson) filed by Long, David Christopher; Long, Kathleen Joanne on 08/28/2020. | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian or Conservator has been Granted. | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Temporary Guardian or Conservator (Kathleen & David Long appointed temporary guardianship, expires 10/06/20) filed by Long, Kathleen Joanne; Long, David Christopher on 08/28/2020. | |
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Related Case (related to D398279) filed by Long, David Christopher; Long, Kathleen Joanne on 08/26/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.