Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Eskandari, Masoud, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brahman, Nina P, against Brooks, Joseph Kenneth, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin G. DeNoce Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2020 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2021 |
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
||
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed by Eskandari, Masoud on 03/22/2021. | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed by Brooks, Joseph Kenneth on 03/15/2021. | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Brooks, Joseph Kenneth on 09/11/2020. | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Brooks, Joseph Kenneth on 09/11/2020. | |
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (STATEMENT OF DAMAGES) filed by Eskandari, Masoud on 08/14/2020. | |
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/16/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Judge: Anthony J. Sabo |
|
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 40.
Judge: Anthony J. Sabo |
|
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Eskandari, Masoud on 07/30/2020. Filed By: Eskandari, Masoud(Plaintiff) Refers To: Brooks, Joseph(Defendant) | |
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Eskandari, Masoud on 07/30/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.