Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Villegas, Rosa, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lewis, Dejon R, against Serobyan, Anait, Nehme, Andrew Jack, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin G. DeNoce Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2020 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Trial Setting Conference - scheduled for 12/06/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in 43 at Ventura. | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for heard 08/08/2022 04:48:00 PM. | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference heard 07/29/2022 08:15:00 AM. | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed by Serobyan, Anait; Nehme, Andrew Jack on 07/07/2022. | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed by Villegas, Rosa on 07/07/2022. | |
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/16/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference - scheduled for 07/29/2022 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Serobyan, Anait; Nehme, Andrew Jack on 12/22/2021. | |
April 16, 2021 |
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
||
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed by Villegas, Rosa on 04/02/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.