Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Barry Gofberg, Lisa, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Fhima, Aaron D, against Volkswagen Group Of America Inc, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin G. DeNoce Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2021 |
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
||
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Barry Gofberg, Lisa on 01/26/2021. | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/16/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Volkswagen Group of America Inc on 09/08/2020. | |
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served CSC Nicole Stauss Person Auth to Accept Service of Process) filed by Barry Gofberg, Lisa on 08/11/2020. | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/16/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Judge: Anthony J. Sabo |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 43.
Judge: Anthony J. Sabo |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Barry Gofberg, Lisa on 07/29/2020. Filed By: Barry Gofberg, Lisa(Plaintiff) Refers To: Volkswagen Group of America Inc(Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.