Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ramirez, Robert J, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Wells, Randy E, against Crowder, Gary P, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin G. DeNoce Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2020 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2021 |
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
||
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/14/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Ramirez, Robert J on 01/19/2021. | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/14/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Judge: Anthony J. Sabo |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 21.
Judge: Anthony J. Sabo |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Ramirez, Robert J on 07/29/2020. Filed By: Ramirez, Robert J(Plaintiff) Refers To: Crowder, Gary(Defendant) | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ramirez, Robert J on 07/29/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.