Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hofelt, Elissa, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Freiman, Lawrence W, against Raypak Inc, Express Services Inc, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Benjamin F. Coats presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin F. Coats Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2021 | |||
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed by Hofelt, Elissa on 03/29/2021. | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of Advance fJury Fee Deposit) filed by Hofelt, Elissa on 03/29/2021. | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order (for Protective Order Confidential Designation ONLY) filed by Raypak Inc; Express Services Inc; Hofelt, Elissa on 01/28/2021. | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Raypak Inc on 09/21/2020. | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served CSC Lawyers Inc., Nicole Stauss. Date of service: 8/7/2020. cost 45.00) filed by Hofelt, Elissa on 09/21/2020. | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served CT Corp Sytem. Peter Cayetano Date of service: 08/10/2020. Cost 0.0) filed by Hofelt, Elissa on 09/21/2020. | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Express Services Inc on 09/09/2020. | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Express Services Inc added as a Defendant effective 09/09/2020. | |
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 08/10/2020.
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.