Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Rainone, Araceli, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Yorke, Brian, against Group Usa Inc, Compass Group North America, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Benjamin F. Coats presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin F. Coats Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2020 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2021 | |||
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed by Rainone, Araceli on 04/06/2021. | |
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting Jury Fees (Defendant Compass group USA, Inc.'s Notice of posting jury fees) filed by Group USA Inc on 11/05/2020. | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Spooner, Gabriel S added as a effective 10/29/2020. | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Group USA Inc added as a Defendant effective 10/29/2020. | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Group USA Inc on 10/28/2020. | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 07/28/2020.
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 40.
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/12/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rainone, Araceli on 07/28/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.