Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
The Becker Group Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cole, James B., against Varsity Sports Training Facility Llc, Ramos, Jose Eduardo, Contreras, Maria Angelica, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin G. DeNoce Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2021 |
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
||
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/12/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court. | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment for The Becker Group Inc against Contreras, Maria Angelica ;Ramos, Jose Eduardo ;Varsity Sports Training Facility LLC in the amount of: 72476.15 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 4574.27 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 3655.00 attorney fees entered on 02/03/2021. | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court filed by The Becker Group Inc on 02/03/2021. | |
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by The Becker Group Inc on 11/25/2020. | |
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of James B Cole RE Money Judgment) filed by The Becker Group Inc on 11/25/2020. | |
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Varsity Sports Training Facility LLC on Complaint. | |
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Ramos, Jose Eduardo on Complaint. | |
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Jeff Becker RE Money Judgment) filed by The Becker Group Inc on 11/25/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.