Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Richardson, Martha, Richardson, Alexis, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin G. DeNoce Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 24, 2020 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2020 |
GAL Martha Richardson, minor Alexis Richardson
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
||
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor (SHC) - GAL Martha Richardson, minor Alexis Richardson scheduled for 08/28/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in 43 at Ventura.
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 43.
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim (of Minor) filed by Richardson, Martha on 07/24/2020. Filed By: Richardson, Martha(Petitioner) Refers To: Richardson, Alexis(Claimant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.