Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Pichon, David, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mccutchan, Charles L., against Crown Dodge, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin G. DeNoce Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 24, 2020 |
CategoryOther Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2021 |
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
||
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/07/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.
Judge: Anthony J. Sabo |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Pichon, David on 10/06/2020. | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by Pichon, David on 09/02/2020. | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Crown Dodge on Complaint. | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Dan S. Wallis - Agent for Service) filed by Pichon, David on 07/27/2020. | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 41.
Judge: Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. |
|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/07/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Judge: Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.