Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Burton, Donna, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Mannis, Todd, against Big Lots Stores Inc, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Matthew P. Guasco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew P. Guasco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 24, 2020 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2021 | |||
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Big Lots Stores Inc on 11/04/2020. | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Rozanski, Keith added as a effective 11/04/2020. | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (by serving Koy Saechao, Authorized to Accept for CSC Lawyers Inc) filed by Burton, Donna on 10/09/2020. | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 20.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/07/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Application/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Burton, Donna on 07/24/2020. | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (GRANTED) filed by Burton, Donna on 07/24/2020. | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Burton, Donna Application for Waiver granted in full. | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Burton, Donna on 07/24/2020. Filed By: Burton, Donna(Plaintiff) Refers To: Big Lots Stores Inc(Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.