Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Smith, Norma Louise, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case against Hamilton, Nicholas Ray, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with JoAnn Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoAnn Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2020 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions137 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time137 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of . | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders has been Dismissed. | |
June 16, 2020 |
Judge: JoAnn Johnson |
||
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
June 02, 2020 |
Judge: William Q. Liebmann |
||
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - scheduled for 06/16/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in 35 at Ventura.
Judge: JoAnn Johnson |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing (Granted on Courts Motion) filed by Smith, Norma Louise on 05/29/2020. | |
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance VENTURA generated. | |
May 04, 2020 |
Judge: William Q. Liebmann |
||
April 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - scheduled for 06/02/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in 33 at Ventura.
Judge: William Q. Liebmann |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.