Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Progressive Express Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nivinskus, Mark R, against Troncoso, Antonio, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2020 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2020 | |||
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (and Court Judgment) filed by Progressive Express Insurance Company on 06/10/2020. | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Progressive Express Insurance Company on 01/31/2020. | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 06/17/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Progressive Express Insurance Company on 01/15/2020. Filed By: Progressive Express Insurance Company(Plaintiff) Refers To: Troncoso, Antonio(Defendant) | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 41. | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Progressive Express Insurance Company on 01/15/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.