Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Perez Ortega, Ana Maria, Rodriguez, Josefina, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Morse, Amy, against Nissan North America Inc, represented by Thomas, Anthony S., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed by Perez Ortega, Ana Maria; Rodriguez, Josefina on 06/10/2020. | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Perez Ortega, Ana Maria; Rodriguez, Josefina on 06/10/2020. | |
June 03, 2020 | |||
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer (Demand for Jury Trial) filed by Nissan North America Inc on 02/06/2020. | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Becky DeGeorge, Agent for CSC, Demand For Jury Trial) filed by Perez Ortega, Ana Maria on 01/27/2020. | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury Trial filed by Perez Ortega, Ana Maria; Rodriguez, Josefina on 12/31/2019. | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 40. | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Perez Ortega, Ana Maria; Rodriguez, Josefina on 12/31/2019. Filed By: Perez Ortega, Ana Maria(Plaintiff) | Rodriguez, Josefina(Plaintiff) Refers To: Nissan North America Inc(Defendant) | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 06/03/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Perez Ortega, Ana Maria; Rodriguez, Josefina on 12/31/2019. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.