Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Valera, Israel, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Morse, Amy, against Nissan North America Inc, represented by Thomas, Anthony S., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Mark S. Borrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark S. Borrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2023 | (7 day Jury Trial) | ||
September 26, 2022 | (7 day Jury Trial) | ||
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 12/22/2022 at 01:30:00 PM in 22 was vacated. | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (LC) - (7 day Jury Trial) scheduled for 01/30/2023 at 01:30:00 PM in 40 was vacated. | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement (10/03/22) filed by Valera, Israel on 08/22/2022. | |
August 22, 2022 | |||
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order (Joint t Continue Trial and All Pre Trial Deadlines) filed by Valera, Israel; Nissan North America Inc on 08/11/2022. | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 12/22/2022 at 01:30:00 PM in 22 at Ventura. | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (LC) - (7 day Jury Trial) scheduled for 01/30/2023 at 01:30:00 PM in 40 at Ventura. | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial Date (and All Pre Trial Deadlines; Forwarded to CR40) received from Valera, Israel; Nissan North America Inc on 08/08/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.