Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hyder &Amp; Company, Hyder & Company, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Yun, Serena, against Zarate, Maria, Zarate, Jose Luis, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Paul W. Baelly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul W. Baelly Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions49 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time155 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned (Unsatisfied) filed by Hyder & Company on 06/03/2020. | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Application for Writ of Possession filed by Hyder & Company on 02/25/2020. | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 02/25/2020. | |
February 18, 2020 |
Time Estimate: 30 minutes
Judge: Paul W. Baelly |
||
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment for Hyder & Company against Zarate, Jose Luis ;Zarate, Maria in the amount of: 2841 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 340.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 450.00 attorney fees entered on 02/18/2020. | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Entry of Judgment (and Judgment) filed by Hyder & Company on 02/18/2020. | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Stipulated judgment. | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Court Trial - Unlawful Detainer heard 02/18/2020 08:30:00 AM. | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | The Court finds judgment for Plaintiff, Hyder & Company, and against Defendants, Jose Luis Zarate; Maria Zarate, with hold over damages in the amount of $2841.00, past due rent $1227.00, pre-judgment costs $ 340.00, attorney fees $450.00. Total judgment $4858.00 . | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Trial - Unlawful Detainer - Time Estimate: 30 minutes scheduled for 02/18/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in 27 at Ventura.
Judge: Paul W. Baelly |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.