We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Kyndra Abron Vs. Jose Luis Gonzalez Carmona

Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago ago

On December 31, 2019 a Pi/Pd/Wd - Auto case was filed by Abron, Kyndra, represented by Mccutchan, Charles L. , against Gonzalez Carmona, Jose Luis, represented by Hummel, Brian G. , in the jurisdiction of Ventura County.

Case Details

Filing Date

December 31, 2019

Last Refreshed

March 11, 2021

Filing Location

Ventura County, CA

Category

Pi/Pd/Wd - Auto

Practice Area

Torts

Matter Type

Automobile

Case Cycle Time

164 days

Time to First Dissmisal Order

164 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Parties

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Attorneys for Defendants

Case History

Type Description
Docket Event Case dismissed with disposition of Dismissed.
Docket Event Case disposed with disposition of Dismissed.
Docket Event Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Abron, Kyndra on 06/12/2020.
Docket Event Notice of Change of Address and/or Telephone (Law Offices of Gomes, Hirshik & Hummel) filed by Gonzalez Carmona, Jose Luis on 01/28/2020.
Docket Event Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (STATEMENT OF DAMAGES) filed by Abron, Kyndra on 01/03/2020.
Docket Event Complaint filed by Abron, Kyndra on 12/31/2019. Filed By: Abron, Kyndra(Plaintiff) Refers To: Gonzalez Carmona, Jose(Defendant)
Docket Event Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Abron, Kyndra on 12/31/2019.
Docket Event MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 06/01/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Docket Event Case assigned to Department 21.
See all events

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.