Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Baywood Apartments Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Meller, Eric, against Castro, Valeria Renae, Castro, Caesar, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Paul W. Baelly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul W. Baelly Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions29 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time66 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned (Satisfied) filed by Baywood Apartments LLC on 03/06/2020. | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned submitted by Baywood Apartments LLC rejected on 03/04/2020. | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 01/31/2020. | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment for Baywood Apartments LLC against Castro, Caesar ;Castro, Valeria Renae in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 01/29/2020. | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Application for Writ of Possession filed by Baywood Apartments LLC on 01/29/2020. | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by Baywood Apartments LLC on 01/29/2020. | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (and Clerks Judgment; and as to Unnamed Occupants) filed by Baywood Apartments LLC on 01/29/2020. | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Castro, Caesar on Complaint. | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Castro, Valeria Renae on Complaint. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.