Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Williams, Lori N, against Sandoval, Michael A, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Mark S. Borrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark S. Borrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement (Completion Date of: 06/20/2020) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/03/2020. | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 01/21/2020. | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 40.
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Reduced Filing Fee B&P 6322.1(c)(1) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 12/30/2019. | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 12/30/2019. Filed By: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Sandoval, Michael(Defendant) | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 12/30/2019. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.