Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Franco, Stephanie Malaski, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Tolhse Productions Llc, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Jeffrey G. Bennett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey G. Bennett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryEnforcement |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Cycle Time30 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Mail Returned Undeliverable (Clerk's Notice of Entry of Judgment- Return to sender, Not deliverable as addressed, Unable to forward.) received from The Superior Court of Ventura on 01/29/2020 | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Mail Returned Undeliverable (Crerk's Notice of Entry of Judgment - Return to sender, Not deliverable as addressed, Unable to forward.) received from The Superior Court of Ventura on 01/06/2020 | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 21.
Judge: Jeffrey G. Bennett |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by LABOR COMMISSIONER on 12/30/2019. | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Labor Board judgment. | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment for Franco, Stephanie Malaski against Tolhse Productions LLC in the amount of: 3323.50 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 12/30/2019. | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by LABOR COMMISSIONER on 12/30/2019. | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Labor Board Judgment - Request for and Entry of filed by LABOR COMMISSIONER on 12/30/2019. Filed By: Franco, Stephanie Malaski(Plaintiff) Refers To: Tolhse Productions LLC(Defendant) | LABOR COMMISSIONER(Interested Party) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.