We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

I Q Data International Inc Vs. Jessica Carroll

Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago ago

On December 30, 2019 a Rule 3.740 Collections case was filed by I Q Data International Inc, represented by Medel, Eric J. , against Carroll, Jessica, Ehle, Todd, represented by in the jurisdiction of Ventura County.

Case Details

Filing Date

December 30, 2019

Last Refreshed

February 21, 2021

Filing Location

Ventura County, CA

Category

Rule 3.740 Collections

Practice Area

Creditor

Matter Type

Collections

Case Cycle Time

163 days

Time to First Dissmisal Order

163 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case History

Type Description
Docket Event Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.
Docket Event Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.
Docket Event Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by I Q Data International Inc on 06/10/2020.
Docket Event Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by I Q Data International Inc on 01/09/2020.
Docket Event Case assigned to Department 40.
Docket Event Complaint filed by I Q Data International Inc on 12/30/2019. Filed By: I Q Data International Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Ehle, Todd(Defendant) | Carroll, Jessica(Defendant)
Docket Event Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by I Q Data International Inc on 12/30/2019.
See all events

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.