We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Matter Of Manuel Uecker

Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago ago

On December 30, 2019 a Petitions - Other case was filed by Uecker, Manuel Raynard, represented by against represented by in the jurisdiction of Ventura County.

Case Details

Filing Date

December 30, 2019

Last Refreshed

March 11, 2021

Filing Location

Ventura County, CA

Category

Petitions - Other

Practice Area

Civil

Matter Type

General Civil

Case Cycle Time

43 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Parties

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Case History

Type Description
Docket Event Petition for Change of Name has been Granted.
Docket Event Decree Changing Name filed by Uecker, Manuel Raynard on 02/11/2020.
Docket Event Proof of Publication (Published 01/09; 01/16; 01/23 & 01/30/2020; VC Reporter) filed by Uecker, Manuel Raynard on 02/03/2020.
Docket Event Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (Granted) filed by Uecker, Manuel Raynard on 12/30/2019.
Docket Event OSC - Change of Name - scheduled for 02/11/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in 21 at Ventura.
Docket Event Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed by Uecker, Manuel Raynard on 12/30/2019.
Docket Event Case assigned to Department 21.
Docket Event Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Uecker, Manuel Raynard on 12/30/2019.
Docket Event Uecker, Manuel Raynard Application for Waiver granted in full.
See all events

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.