Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lackey, Daniel Jr, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Flores, Mark K, against Gonzalez, David, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2022 | |||
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing VENTURA generated. | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 01/07/2022 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
June 01, 2020 | |||
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lackey, Daniel Jr on 12/30/2019. | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 06/01/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Lackey, Daniel Jr on 12/30/2019. Filed By: Lackey, Daniel Jr(Plaintiff) Refers To: Gonzalez, David(Defendant) | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 20. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.