Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard, Robert Scott, against Aaronson, Frank S, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions59 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Aaronson, Frank S on Complaint. | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (and Clerks Judgment) filed by BANK OF AMERICA NA on 02/24/2020. | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by BANK OF AMERICA NA on 01/21/2020. | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 42.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by BANK OF AMERICA NA on 12/27/2019. | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by BANK OF AMERICA NA on 12/27/2019. Filed By: BANK OF AMERICA NA(Plaintiff) Refers To: Aaronson, Frank(Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.