Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Karayan, Sarkis S., against Burton, Kristi, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Jeffrey G. Bennett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey G. Bennett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service filed by LVNV Funding LLC on 06/11/2020. | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service filed by LVNV Funding LLC on 01/29/2020. | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 21.
Judge: Jeffrey G. Bennett |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by LVNV Funding LLC on 12/20/2019. | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by LVNV Funding LLC on 12/20/2019. Filed By: LVNV Funding LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Burton, Kristi(Defendant) | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non Military Status filed by LVNV Funding LLC on 12/20/2019. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.