Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Basler, Dean J, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bredlau, Richard R., against Camacho, Raul Saul, City Of Oxnard, represented by Finck, Bruce A, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2019 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment for Camacho, Raul Saul against Basler, Dean J in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 10/25/2021. | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment on Motion for Summary Judgment (in Favor of Defendant Raul Saul Camacho) filed by Camacho, Raul Saul on 10/25/2021. | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court (Received on 10 06 2021) submitted by Camacho, Raul Saul rejected on 10/15/2021. | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Correspondence submitted by Camacho, Raul Saul rejected on 10/06/2021. | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Ruling on Submitted Matter heard 09/16/2021 04:41:00 PM. | |
September 16, 2021 | |||
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | The Court takes this matter under submission as of 08/30/2021. | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion for Summary Judgment heard 08/30/2021 08:20:00 AM. | |
August 30, 2021 |
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
||
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply (in Support of his Motion for Summary Judgment Adjudction and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Separate Statement of Disputed and Undisputed Facts) filed by Camacho, Raul Saul on 08/25/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.