Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Henriques, Janalie, against Zaragoza, Eduardo, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Mark S. Borrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark S. Borrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2019 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions78 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (and Clerks Judgment) filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 03/06/2020. | |
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Zaragoza, Eduardo on Complaint. | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 01/14/2020. | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 40.
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 12/19/2019. Filed By: Capital One Bank USA NA(Plaintiff) Refers To: Zaragoza, Eduardo(Defendant) | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 12/19/2019. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.