Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Northern California Collection Service Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cribb, Steven D., against Cal Veg Farm Inc, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Jeffrey G. Bennett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey G. Bennett Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2019 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions74 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Cal Veg Farm Inc on Complaint. | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (and Clerks Judgment) filed by Northern California Collection Service Inc on 03/02/2020. | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Jennie L Armellino, CFO) filed by Northern California Collection Service Inc on 02/10/2020. | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 21.
Judge: Jeffrey G. Bennett |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Northern California Collection Service Inc on 12/19/2019. | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Northern California Collection Service Inc on 12/19/2019. Filed By: Northern California Collection Service Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Cal Veg Farm Inc(Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.