Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Elsass, Charles, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case against Devore, Janine, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with William Q. Liebmann presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam Q. Liebmann Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2020 |
Judge: William Q. Liebmann |
||
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - rescheduled to 02/04/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in 33 at Ventura.
Judge: William Q. Liebmann |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - scheduled for 02/04/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in 33 at Ventura.
Judge: William Q. Liebmann |
|
January 14, 2020 |
Judge: William Q. Liebmann |
||
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing (Granted) filed by Elsass, Charles on 01/14/2020. | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - scheduled for 01/14/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in 33 at Ventura.
Judge: William Q. Liebmann |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - scheduled for 12/20/2019 at 11:30:00 AM in 33 at Ventura.
Judge: William Q. Liebmann |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 33.
Judge: William Q. Liebmann |
|
December 20, 2019 |
Judge: William Q. Liebmann |
||
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders filed by Elsass, Charles on 12/20/2019. Filed By: Elsass, Charles(Petitioner) Refers To: Devore, Janine(Respondent) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.