Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Larson, Veronica, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Urbina, Carmona Kristal, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Judith D. Rhodes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudith D. Rhodes Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryHarassment |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions52 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Case Cycle Time52 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2020 |
Judge: Judith D. Rhodes |
||
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Consent to Commisioner Rhodes) filed by Urbina, Carmona Kristal on 02/10/2020. | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders has been Dismissed. | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of . | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (CH-109 Notice of Court Hearing, CH-110 Temporary Restraining Order, CH-100 Request for Civil Harassment Restrainig Order and Declaration re: Ex parte Notice) filed by Larson, Veronica on 01/23/2020. | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - PERSONAL (Order on Request to continue hearing) filed by Larson, Veronica on 01/23/2020. | |
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 02/10/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: Judith D. Rhodes |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - rescheduled to 02/10/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: Judith D. Rhodes |
|
January 10, 2020 |
Judge: Judith D. Rhodes |
||
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing (Granted) filed by Larson, Veronica on 01/10/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.