Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Thomas, Vanessa, against Butterfield, Brandon C, represented by Jacobs, Lynda, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Matthew P. Guasco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew P. Guasco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2019 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - MAILING (Answer) filed by Butterfield, Brandon C on 02/25/2020. | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Butterfield, Brandon C on 02/25/2020. | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Randy Doe, Refused to give name; co resident) filed by BANK OF AMERICA NA on 01/23/2020. | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 20.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by BANK OF AMERICA NA on 12/19/2019. | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by BANK OF AMERICA NA on 12/19/2019. Filed By: BANK OF AMERICA NA(Plaintiff) Refers To: Butterfield, Brandon(Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.