Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ramos, Helen, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Herman, Richard A, against Wood Ranch Bbq &Amp; Grill Inc, Moorpark Plaza Family Partnership Ltd, Wood Ranch Bbq & Grill Inc, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time3 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2020 | |||
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 05/22/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Ramos, Helen on 12/20/2019. | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Ramos, Helen on 12/20/2019. Filed By: Ramos, Helen(Plaintiff) Refers To: Wood Ranch BBQ & Grill Inc(Defendant) | MOORPARK PLAZA FAMILY PARTNERSHIP LTD(Defendant) | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 21. | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ramos, Helen on 12/20/2019. | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 05/22/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.