Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Thomas, Vanessa, against Magana, Raul, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincent J. O'Neill, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2019 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions47 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time47 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by BANK OF AMERICA NA on 02/04/2020. | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service filed by BANK OF AMERICA NA on 01/28/2020. | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 41.
Judge: Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by BANK OF AMERICA NA on 12/19/2019. | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by BANK OF AMERICA NA on 12/19/2019. Filed By: BANK OF AMERICA NA(Plaintiff) Refers To: Magana, Raul(Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.