Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ortiz Garcia, Leonides, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Coons, Michael H, against Strodtman, Susan, Garcia, Rosa, Garcia, Joe, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 19, 2019 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Other |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions34 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time35 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2020 | |||
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 05/22/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Ortiz Garcia, Leonides on 01/22/2020. | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Ortiz Garcia, Leonides on 12/19/2019. Filed By: Ortiz Garcia, Leonides(Plaintiff) Refers To: Strodtman, Susan(Defendant) | Garcia, Rosa(Defendant) | Garcia, Joe(Defendant) | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 41. | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ortiz Garcia, Leonides on 12/19/2019. | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 05/22/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.