Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Labor Commissioner filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against E &Amp; Ring Managment Corporation, E & Ring Managment Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Benjamin F. Coats presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin F. Coats Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 08, 2019 |
CategoryJudicial Review - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2021 | and Filing of Dismissal | ||
June 15, 2021 | and Filing of Dismissal | ||
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Lackey, Tracie on 06/15/2021. | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference re Settlement - and Filing of Dismissal scheduled for 07/15/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 43 at Ventura.
Judge: Benjamin F. Coats |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Status Conference re Settlement heard 06/15/2021 08:30:00 AM. | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference re Settlement - and Filing of Dismissal scheduled for 07/15/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 43 was vacated.
Judge: Benjamin F. Coats |
|
May 25, 2021 | and Filing of Dismissal | ||
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference re Settlement - and Filing of Dismissal scheduled for 06/15/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 43 at Ventura.
Judge: Benjamin F. Coats |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.