Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Zide, Flint C, against Blanchard, Linda S, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Mark S. Borrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark S. Borrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2019 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions129 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time234 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court filed by BANK OF AMERICA NA on 06/25/2020. | |
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court. | |
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment for BANK OF AMERICA NA against Blanchard, Linda S in the amount of: 10928.65 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 439.50 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 06/25/2020. | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (and Court Judgment) filed by BANK OF AMERICA NA on 03/12/2020. | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does (1-5) filed by BANK OF AMERICA NA on 03/12/2020. | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Blanchard, Linda S on Complaint. | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non Military Status filed by BANK OF AMERICA NA on 03/12/2020. | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by BANK OF AMERICA NA on 03/12/2020. | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Flint C Zide/Sarkis S Karayan re Waiver of Interest Excess of 0% and Attorney Fees) filed by BANK OF AMERICA NA on 03/12/2020. | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served John Doe, co-resident) filed by BANK OF AMERICA NA on 12/03/2019. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.