Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cendejas, Sergio, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Ruiz, Ruben M, against Clinicas Del Camino Real Inc, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Matthew P. Guasco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew P. Guasco Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2019 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions64 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2021 |
Further Responses from Plaintiff Sergio Cendejas to Nos 6 and 24 of Special Interrogatories set one ...
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
||
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel - Further Responses from Plaintiff Sergio Cendejas to Nos 6 and 24 of Special Interrogatories set one and No 210 2 of Form Interrogatories Employment Set One scheduled for 01/21/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 was vacated.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Further Responses from Plaintiff Sergio Cendejas to Nos 6 and 24 of Special Interrogatories Set One and No 210.2 of Form Interrogatories Employment Set One and Request to Vacate Hearing thereon) filed by Clinicas Del Camino Real Inc on 01/06/2021. | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Amended (Proof of Service to Defendant Clinicas Del Camino Real Incs Motion to Compel and Separate Statement) filed by Clinicas Del Camino Real Inc on 12/03/2020. | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel - Further Responses from Plaintiff Sergio Cendejas to Nos 6 and 24 of Special Interrogatories set one and No 210 2 of Form Interrogatories Employment Set One scheduled for 01/21/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Amount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 12/01/2020. | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Separate Statement (in Support of its Motion to Compel Further Responses From Plaintiff Sergio Cendejas to Nos 6 and 24 of Special Interrog, Set One, and No 210.2 of Form Interrog - Employment Set One) filed by Clinicas Del Camino Real Inc on 12/01/2020. | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel (Further Responses from Plaintiff Sergio Cendejas to Nos. 6 and 24 of Special Interrogatories- Employment, Set One; Declaration of Jessica M. Wan; Exhibits 1-14) filed by Clinicas Del Camino Real Inc on 11/30/2020. | |
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/10/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Clinicas Del Camino Real Inc on 06/25/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.